CO HB1175 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit Conversion Therapy
Title
Prohibit Conversion Therapy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1175 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 15-1175 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1175 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 15-1175 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1175 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2015-03-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-09 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-03-06 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-26 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/06/2015 - No Amendments |
2015-02-24 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |