CO HB1165 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-15 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-15 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
St Land Bd Bond Convey Local Gov
Title
St Land Bd Bond Convey Local Gov
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1165, without amendment, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1165, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1165, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-04-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-08 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-04-08 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-31 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-30 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-29 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-23 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Committee on Local Government and Energy Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-24 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government and Energy | |
2010-02-22 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-19 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-09 | House Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-01-22 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |