CO HB1164 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning reductions in the property tax credits that apply to school districts' total program mill levies for purposes of funding the "Public School Finance Act of 1994".
Title
Total Program Mill Levy Tax Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1164 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 21-1164 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1164 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 21-1164 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1164 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 21-1164 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1164 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 21-1164 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 05/24/2021 - No Amendments |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 05/20/2021 - No Amendments |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 05/14/2021 - No Amendments |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 05/12/2021 - No Amendments |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 05/7/2021 - No Amendments |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/30/2021 - No Amendments |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/26/2021 - No Amendments |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/21/2021 - No Amendments |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/05/2021 - No Amendments |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2021-03-16 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-12 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-03-12 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-10 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |