CO HB1162 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the regulation of consumer legal funding transactions, and, in connection therewith, authorizing the administrator of the "Uniform Consumer Credit Code" to adopt rules regulating creditor-imposed charges for certain consumer credit transactions that are secured by a consumer's potential proceeds from a settlement or judgment obtained in an associated legal claim.
Title
Consumer Legal Funding Transactions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 23-1162 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 23-1162, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment A). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 23-1162, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 23-1162 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 23-1162, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment A). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 23-1162, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2023-04-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-17 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-04-13 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-04-10 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-02 | House | House Committee on Finance Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2023-02-16 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Finance |
2023-02-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |