CO HB1160 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning authorizing a local education provider to determine the language in which a student who is an English language learner takes reading assessments in kindergarten through third grade.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Kindergarten Through Third Grade English Learner Reading Assessment Language

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-19 - House - House: Concur in Senate Amendment (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 17-1160, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1160, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1160, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06 Governor Signed
2017-05-15 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-15SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-05-11HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2017-04-21SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2017-04-20SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2017-04-19SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-04-18SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2017-04-17SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2017-04-13SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2017-04-12SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2017-04-11SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2017-04-06SenateSenate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2017-03-03SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
2017-03-03HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-03-02HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2017-02-27HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2017-02-06HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb17-1160
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1160_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1160_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1160_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1160_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1160_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1160_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hed2017a2017-02-27t133017z-hb17-1160-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hed2017a2017-02-27t133017z-hb17-1160-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520House%2520Journal.pdf#386
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sed2017a2017-04-06t133311z-hb17-1160-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sed2017a2017-04-06t133311z-hb17-1160-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520Senate%2520Journal.pdf#843
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520House%2520Journal.pdf#1009

Bill Comments

feedback