CO HB1159 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning waste diversion, and, in connection therewith, creating the circular economy development center in the department of public health and environment, establishing the costs of operating the center as a permissible use of money from the front range waste diversion cash fund and the recycling resources economic opportunity fund, and extending and removing certain repeal dates associated with existing statutory waste diversion efforts.
Title
Waste Diversion And Circular Economy Development Center
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1159 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 22-1159, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 22-1159, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1159 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 22-1159, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 22-1159, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2022-03-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-03-03 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment |