CO HB1156 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 19 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 19 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning authorization to hold special events where substances that minors are prohibited from purchasing are served.
Title
Chamber of Commerce Alcohol Special Event Permit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 24-1156, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.012 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 24-1156, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1156, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1156, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 24-1156, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.012 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 24-1156, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1156, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1156, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2024-04-18 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2024-03-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-03-05 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-02-29 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |