CO HB1156 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning modernization of the public airport authority act.
Title
Public Airport Authority Act Modernization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 23-1156 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 23-1156, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 23-1156 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 23-1156, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | Governor Signed | |
2023-04-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-03-31 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2023-02-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-02-24 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2023-02-21 | House | House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-01-31 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government |