CO HB1154 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes Against Pregnant Women Act
Title
Crimes Against Pregnant Women Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Foote [D] | Sen. Pat Steadman [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1154 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1154 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1154, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1154, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1154, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend prepared amendment L.001, page 2, strike line 4 (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment F) (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A). (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment E) (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend prepared amendment L.001, page 2, strike line 4 (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment F) (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A). (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment E) (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1154, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1154 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1154 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1154, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1154, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1154, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend prepared amendment L.001, page 2, strike line 4 (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment F) (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A). (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment E) (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend prepared amendment L.001, page 2, strike line 4 (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment F) (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A). (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment E) (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1154, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-03-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-15 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-11 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-08 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-19 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-01-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |