CO HB1152 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Senate Committee on Local Government & Housing Refer Amended to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Senate Committee on Local Government & Housing Refer Amended to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning increasing the number of accessory dwelling units, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Accessory Dwelling Units
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer House Bill 24-1152, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1152, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.015 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1152, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1152, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1152, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.015 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1152, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1152, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government & Housing Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government & Housing |
2024-04-14 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-12 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-27 | House | House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-01-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government |