CO HB1146 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit Greyhound Racing
Title
Prohibit Greyhound Racing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1146 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1146 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1146, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1146, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1146 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1146, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1146, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-02-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-02-28 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-02-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2014-02-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-05 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-01-30 | House | House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development |