CO HB1143 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-24)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning forensic medical evidence of sexual assault.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protect Survivors' Rights To Rape Kit Evidence

Sponsors

Rep. Meg Froelich [D]Rep. Matt Soper [R]Sen. Jessie Danielson [D]Rep. Judith Amabile [D]
Rep. Jennifer Arndt [D]Rep. Jennifer Bacon [D]Rep. Adrienne Benavidez [D]Rep. Tracey Bernett [D]
Rep. Shannon Bird [D]Rep. Rod Bockenfeld [R]Rep. Yadira Caraveo [D]Rep. Terri Carver [R]
Rep. Lisa Cutter [D]Rep. Monica Duran [D]Rep. Daneya Esgar [D]Rep. Thomas Exum [D]
Rep. Alec Garnett [D]Rep. Tim Geitner [R]Rep. Serena Gonzales-Gutierrez [D]Rep. Leslie Herod [D]
Rep. Dominique Jackson [D]Rep. Iman Jodeh [D]Rep. Chris Kennedy [D]Rep. Cathy Kipp [D]
Rep. Susan Lontine [D]Rep. Stephanie Luck [R]Rep. Julie McCluskie [D]Rep. Karen McCormick [D]
Rep. Hugh McKean [R]Rep. Barbara McLachlan [D]Rep. Dafna Michaelson Jenet [D]Rep. Kyle Mullica [D]
Rep. David Ortiz [D]Rep. Rod Pelton [R]Rep. Andres Pico [R]Rep. Naquetta Ricks [D]
Rep. Dylan Roberts [D]Rep. Shane Sandridge [R]Rep. Emily Sirota [D]Rep. Tom Sullivan [D]
Rep. Brianna Titone [D]Rep. Alex Valdez [D]Rep. Donald Valdez [D]Rep. Kevin Van Winkle [R]
Rep. Michael Weissman [D]Rep. Perry Will [R]Rep. Dave Williams [R]Rep. Steven Woodrow [D]
Rep. Mary Young [D]Sen. Jeff Bridges [D]Sen. Janet Buckner [D]Sen. John Cooke [R]
Sen. Donald Coram [R]Sen. Kerry Donovan [D]Sen. Stephen Fenberg [D]Sen. Rhonda Fields [D]
Sen. Leroy Garcia [D]Sen. Bob Gardner [R]Sen. Joann Ginal [D]Sen. Julie Gonzales [D]
Sen. Chris Hansen [D]Sen. Dennis Hisey [R]Sen. Chris Holbert [R]Sen. Sonya Jaquez Lewis [D]
Sen. Pete Lee [D]Sen. Larry Liston [R]Sen. Paul Lundeen [R]Sen. Brittany Pettersen [D]
Sen. Kevin Priola [R]Sen. Robert Rankin [R]Sen. Robert Rodriguez [D]Sen. Ray Scott [R]
Sen. Cleave Simpson [R]Sen. Tammy Story [D]Sen. Faith Winter [D]Sen. Rob Woodward [R]
Sen. Rachel Zenzinger [D]

Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1143 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1143 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-27 Governor Signed
2021-05-21 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-05-19HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-04-28SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-27SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-22SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-04-01SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2021-03-30HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-03-29HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2021-03-24HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-03-02HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1143
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1143_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1143_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1143_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1143_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1143_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1143_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1143_L.003.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1143_00.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/90e35cdde65bb053872586a2007a7195-hb21-1143-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1143vote55beb9
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e62271d3df536859872586bf006b7aaf-hb21-1143-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1143vote5412a0

Bill Comments 750

feedback