CO HB1142 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning measures related to eyewitness identification techniques, and, in connection therewith, requiring reporting data related to eyewitness techniques and regulating the use of showup identifications.
Title
Eyewitness Identification Showup Regulations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 47 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: This is a conceptual amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1142, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment C) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1142, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1142 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1142, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 47 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: This is a conceptual amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1142, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment C) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1142, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1142 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1142, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-21 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-05-19 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-04-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-27 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-04-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-31 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |