CO HB1139 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-18)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-18)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the acquisition of forms of identification from the department of revenue, and, in connection therewith, facilitating the renewal of drivers' licenses by mail and by electronic means, facilitating the renewal of identification cards by electronic means, facilitating the renewal of drivers' licenses and identification cards by older individuals, and allowing certain individuals to sign a driving log attesting that a minor driver with an instruction permit has completed a minimum number of driving hours.
Title
Driver's License Electronic Renewal By Seniors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 21-1139 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1139, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1139, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 21-1139 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1139, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1139, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Governor Signed | |
2021-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2021-04-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-07 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-04-06 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-03-31 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |