CO HB1137 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning supporting high school students' interest in early childhood education through the teacher cadet program.
Title
Expand Teacher Cadet Program Include Early Childhood Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 19-1137 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1137 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 19-1137 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1137 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Governor Signed | |
2019-03-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-03-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2019-02-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-15 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-12 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |