CO HB1133 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the cost of communications services for persons in custody, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Cost Of Phone Calls For Persons In Custody
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1133 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1133 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1133, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1133 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1133 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1133 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1133, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1133 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2023-04-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-20 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2023-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-04-18 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-21 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2023-01-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |