CO HB1131 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Cyber Bullying
Title
Cyber Bullying
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 14-1131 indefinitely at the request of the sponsors (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1131 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1131 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1131, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003, as amended (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003, as amended (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1131, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. Committee discussion ensued (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1131 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1131 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1131, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003, as amended (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003, as amended (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1131, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. Committee discussion ensued (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations |
2014-03-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-11 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-03-10 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-03-07 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-24 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-01-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |