CO HB1129 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-11 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-11 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Evidence-based Practices For Offender Services
Title
Evidence-based Practices For Offender Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1129 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1129 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW - amended The motion passed on a vote of 10-0. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-03-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW - amended The motion passed on a vote of 10-0. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1129, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1129, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1129 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1129 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW - amended The motion passed on a vote of 10-0. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-03-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW - amended The motion passed on a vote of 10-0. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1129, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1129, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-11 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-02 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-04-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-03 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-02 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-01 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-27 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-19 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |