CO HB1127 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning an extension of the employment-after-retirement limitations for retirees of the public employees' retirement association employed by a board of cooperative services after retirement.
Title
Extend Public Employees' Retirement Association Retiree Work After Retirement Limit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1127 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1127 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1127 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1127 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1127 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1127 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2020-02-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-27 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-25 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-21 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-10 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |