CO HB1125 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Regulate Grease Collection & Disposal
Title
Regulate Grease Collection & Disposal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Move to adopt draft conference committee report .001 to the rerevised bill (Attachment A) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1125 to Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - moved to floor (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1125, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1125 to Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - moved to floor (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1125, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-06 | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass | |
2010-05-05 | First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments | |
2010-04-30 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee | |
2010-04-30 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-23 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-30 | Senate Committee on Local Government and Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-03-23 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government and Energy + Appropriations | |
2010-03-22 | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-19 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-12 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-02 | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-01-15 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy + Appropriations |