CO HB1124 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 23 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning clarification of the period following the declaration by the governor of a disaster emergency in a county within which the board of county commissioners may transfer county general fund money to the county road and bridge fund for the purposes of disaster response and recovery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disaster Emergency Transfers From County General Funds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1124 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1124 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-23 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-03SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-02SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-25SenateSenate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-13SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
2020-02-12HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-11HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-10HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-04HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-15HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1124
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1124_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1124_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1124_rn2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1124_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1124_rr2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1124_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fc476addfed90b36872585040075dbb2-hb20-1124-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1124vote5a5cb4
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/86cdd45ea4d877298725851900752b5f-hb20-1124-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1124vote598f97

Bill Comments

feedback