CO HB1110 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
School Boards & Executive Session
Title
School Boards & Executive Session
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 14-1110 indefinitely at the sponsor's request (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 14-1110 indefinitely at the sponsor's request (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1110 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment to eliminate the "web site" component of the requirement for public posting of board minutes (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment to eliminate the exception allowing collective bargaining agreements to be negotiated in executive session (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment that would eliminate the "web site" component of the requirement for public posting of board minutes (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment that would eliminate the exception that allows collective bargaining agreements to be negotiated in executive session (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1110 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 14-1110 indefinitely at the sponsor's request (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1110 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment to eliminate the "web site" component of the requirement for public posting of board minutes (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment to eliminate the exception allowing collective bargaining agreements to be negotiated in executive session (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment that would eliminate the "web site" component of the requirement for public posting of board minutes (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment that would eliminate the exception that allows collective bargaining agreements to be negotiated in executive session (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1110 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-02-13 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-12 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2014-02-10 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Floor |
2014-02-06 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-02-03 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |