CO HB1109 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning an addition to the definition of "other outlet" to enable a licensed convalescent center to operate a pharmacy for the benefit of patients being treated in the convalescent center.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Convalescent Centers As Pharmacies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1109 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1109 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07 Governor Signed
2019-03-01 Sent to the Governor
2019-03-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-01HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-02-26SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-25SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-20SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-02-12SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2019-02-12HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-11HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-02-05HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 02/12/2019 - No Amendments
2019-02-01HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1109
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1109_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1109_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1109_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1109_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1109_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1109_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3bd1c0422d10b44887258394006e8fce-hb19-1109-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1109vote5ae05e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/869566c9c724fb90872583a700603e47-hb19-1109-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1109vote5cb6b0

Bill Comments

feedback