CO HB1104 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning family preservation safeguards for parents with disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family Preservation For Parents With Disability

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1104 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment S), as amended. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment T) to amendment L.010 (Attachment S). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1104, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25 Governor Signed
2018-04-19 Sent to the Governor
2018-04-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-04-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-04-05SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-05SenateSenate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments
2018-04-05SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-04SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-03-29SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-03-26SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2018-03-20HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-03-19HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2018-03-16HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 03/19/2018 - No Amendments
2018-03-13HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-02-20HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2018-01-18HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb18-1104
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1104_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1104_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1104_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1104_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1104_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1104_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hphc2018a2018-03-13t134902z-hb18-1104-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1104vote54d6fd
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hphc2018a2018-03-13t134902z-hb18-1104-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hphc2018a2018-03-13t134902z-hb18-1104-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/shhs2018a2018-03-29t133328z-hb18-1104-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1104vote5e854b
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1104vote5eb426

Bill Comments

feedback