CO HB1104 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the exclusion from state taxable income of the monetary value of any medal won by an athlete while competing for the United States of America at the olympic games, so long as the athlete's federal adjusted gross income does not exceed a specified amount.
Title
Exclude Olympic Medal Income From Taxable Income
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1104, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1104 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1104, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1104, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment D). (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1104, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1104 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1104, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1104, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment D). (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate Recalled Bill From House |
2017-04-12 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 04/17/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-10 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-06 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-05 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-04 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-03 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-03-31 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 04/03/2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/27/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2017-03-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-08 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-03-07 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-03-03 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-13 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-01-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |