CO HB1103 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-07 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-07 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Catastrophic Illness Fund For Children
Title
Catastrophic Illness Fund For Children
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Steadman [D] | Sen. Nancy Todd [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - PI (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1103, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1103, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1103, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1103, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1103, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1103, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-07 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-04-27 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations | |
2010-04-26 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-23 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-20 | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/23/2010 | |
2010-04-16 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-10 | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-02-25 | House Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Amended to Finance | |
2010-01-14 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health and Human Services + Finance + Appropriations |