CO HB1102 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning requirements for individuals appointed to serve in certain independent agencies of the judicial department.
Title
Independent Agency Appointment Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1102 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1102 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1102 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1102 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Governor Signed | |
2024-04-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-04-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-02-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-09 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-06 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |