CO HB1101 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning support for transit, and, in connection therewith, increasing the flexibility of the ozone season transit grant program and increasing opportunities for transit agency participation in regional transportation planning.
Title
Ozone Season Transit Grant Program Flexibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-21 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Adopt Ccr (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Joint - CC_HB23-1101_2023A: Adopt the first report of the second conference committee on HB23-1101. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Conference Committee Report 2nd Comm (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report 2nd Committee (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report 2nd Committee (Y: 17 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-20 - Joint - CC_HB23-1101_2023A: Amend the conference committee report as mentioned above. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Joint - CC_HB23-1101_2023A: Adopt the First Report of First Conference Committee on House Bill 23-1101 CLHB1101.001 as amended. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Joint - CC_HB23-1101_2023A: Amend the committee report as mentioned above. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House: Senate Amendments Not Cncr (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 23-1101, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment E). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment D). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 23-1101, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Adopt Ccr (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Joint - CC_HB23-1101_2023A: Adopt the first report of the second conference committee on HB23-1101. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Conference Committee Report 2nd Comm (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report 2nd Committee (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report 2nd Committee (Y: 17 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-20 - Joint - CC_HB23-1101_2023A: Amend the conference committee report as mentioned above. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Joint - CC_HB23-1101_2023A: Adopt the First Report of First Conference Committee on House Bill 23-1101 CLHB1101.001 as amended. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Joint - CC_HB23-1101_2023A: Amend the committee report as mentioned above. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House: Senate Amendments Not Cncr (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 23-1101, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment E). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment D). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 23-1101, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | Governor Signed | |
2023-04-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-04-21 | House | House Consideration of Second Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate Consideration of Second Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2023-04-17 | Second Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments | |
2023-04-12 | House | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Reject, Discharge and Appoint |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Reject, Discharge and Appoint |
2023-03-20 | First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments | |
2023-03-20 | First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments | |
2023-03-14 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2023-03-13 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-03-11 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-03-10 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-03-09 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-03-08 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-03-07 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-03-06 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2023-02-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-02-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-02-02 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment |