CO HB1101 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-5)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-5)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the expansion of a program that allows a public employees' retirement association service retiree to work full-time without any reduction in the service retiree's retirement benefits for a rural school district that has a critical shortage of qualified individuals with specific experience, skills, or qualifications that the service retiree has.
Title
Public Employees' Retirement Association Service Retiree Employment In Rural Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.004) (Y: 4 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 22-1101 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 22-1101, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 22-1101, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.004) (Y: 4 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 22-1101 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 22-1101, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 22-1101, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Governor Signed | |
2022-03-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2022-02-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-23 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-01-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |