CO HB1098 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Red Light Camera

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Red Light Camera

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment. Add the phrase "surveillance camera" after the word "automated" in several locations as specified in the committee report, and allow the drafter to make technical conforming changes (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.036 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.035 (Attachment B) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1098, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1098 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1098, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-03HouseGovernor Vetoed
2015-05-18HouseSent to the Governor
2015-05-18HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-05-06HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2015-05-06SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-05-05SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-05-04SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-05-01SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2015-05-01HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-30HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2015-04-28HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2015-04-24HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-02-25HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations
2015-01-15HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E0978D988105E64287257D90007771F2?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E0978D988105E64287257D90007771F2/$FILE/1098_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E0978D988105E64287257D90007771F2/$FILE/1098te_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E0978D988105E64287257D90007771F2/$FILE/1098_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E0978D988105E64287257D90007771F2/$FILE/1098_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E0978D988105E64287257D90007771F2/$FILE/1098ssta_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E0978D988105E64287257D90007771F2/$FILE/1098_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E0978D988105E64287257D90007771F2/$FILE/1098_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E0978D988105E64287257D90007771F2/$FILE/1098_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/DC9DC44DB48D5B5587257DF700817E63
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C75547A4B84A9AC187257DF70080FE52
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C33CD2948F2F2F2A87257E31004EB502
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/DA268607D0C282F287257E3B007B56D6
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A52231C5E03985AC87257E3B007A37EC
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6794EAEAC2DA701F87257E3B007A446A
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/195B198C7629E30087257E3B007A4924

Bill Comments

feedback