CO HB1095 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 13 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the authority of a local government's master plan to include policies to implement state water plan goals as a condition of development approvals, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Governments Water Elements In Master Plans

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-13 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1095, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 20-1095 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-02-03 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 20-1095, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 20-1095, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-23 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-13SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2020-03-12SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2020-03-11SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-10SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-03-06SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-20SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-02-13SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources
2020-02-12HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-11HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-10HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-02-03HouseHouse Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-13HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1095
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1095_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1095_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1095_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1095_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1095_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1095_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6b0d2b40ad4b0f47872585030077d334-hb20-1095-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6b0d2b40ad4b0f47872585030077d334-hb20-1095-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6b0d2b40ad4b0f47872585030077d334-hb20-1095-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1095vote5ab9a6
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c45d03af65b21e6c87258514007391e9-hb20-1095-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ae3df7c957d3454b872585230052cdfe-hb20-1095-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ae3df7c957d3454b872585230052cdfe-hb20-1095-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1095vote57ff56
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1095vote5567fc
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1095vote555225

Bill Comments

feedback