CO HB1091 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-5)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-5)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning sentencing parity for juveniles convicted as adults following the transfer of charges with juveniles convicted as adults following the direct filing of charges.
Title
Sentencing Juveniles Transferred To Adult Court
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1091, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1091, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1091 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1091, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1091, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1091 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Governor Signed | |
2021-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-04-22 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-03-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-02-24 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |