CO HB1086 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning prohibiting openly carrying firearms at a voting location.
Title
The Vote Without Fear Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1086 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1086 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1086 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1086 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Governor Signed | |
2022-03-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2022-02-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-25 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2022-02-23 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/25/2022 - No Amendments |
2022-02-22 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-02-17 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/22/2022 - No Amendments |
2022-02-14 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |