CO HB1083 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-29 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-29 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hydroelectricity & Pumped Hydro
Title
Hydroelectricity & Pumped Hydro
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1083 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1083 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1083 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1083, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1083, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1083, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1083 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1083 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1083, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1083, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1083, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-03-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-03-25 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-03-25 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-03-21 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2011-03-17 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2011-03-15 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-21 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy | |
2011-02-15 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-14 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-10 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-02-07 | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-20 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |