CO HB1078 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning prescription drug claims submitted by a pharmacy, and, in connection therewith, prohibiting retroactive fees.
Title
Pharmacy Benefit Management Firm Claims Payments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.010) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1078 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-29 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 20-1078, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 20-1078, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.010) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1078 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-29 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 20-1078, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 20-1078, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Governor Signed | |
2020-03-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-03-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-13 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2020-02-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-05 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-02-03 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-01-29 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |