CO HB1076 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning carpooling service internet applications, and, in connection therewith, requiring that application owners or operators register with the department of transportation.
Title
Carpooling Service Internet Application Register Colorado Department Of Transportation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 21-1076 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - H_TLG_2021: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - H_TLG_2021: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - H_TLG_2021: Refer House Bill 21-1076, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1076, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 21-1076 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - H_TLG_2021: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - H_TLG_2021: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - H_TLG_2021: Refer House Bill 21-1076, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1076, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2021-03-16 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-12 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - No Amendments |
2021-03-11 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-03-09 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |