CO HB1069 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-24)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-24)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning enhancing the enforcement of crimes of sexual exploitation of a child, and, in connection therewith, requiring a post-enactment review of the implementation of this act and making an appropriation.
Title
Enforcement Of Sexual Exploitation Of A Child
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1069 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1069 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1069, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1069, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1069, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1069 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1069 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1069 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1069 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1069, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1069, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1069, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1069 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1069 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-07 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-06-01 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-04-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-23 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-11 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-03-02 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Finance |
2021-02-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |