CO HB1068 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning pet animal ownership in housing, and, in connection therewith, prohibiting restrictions on dog breeds for obtaining homeowner's insurance, providing for the manner in which pet animals are handled when a writ of restitution is executed, limiting security deposits and rent for pet animals, and excluding pet animals from personal property liens.
Title
Pet Animal Ownership In Housing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer House Bill 23-1068, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.020 (Attachment B). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.019) (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 23-1068 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 23-1068, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment F). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment E). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer House Bill 23-1068, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.020 (Attachment B). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.019) (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 23-1068 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 23-1068, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment F). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment E). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-04-26 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2023-04-20 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government & Housing Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government & Housing |
2023-03-13 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2023-03-11 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-03-09 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-03-06 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-22 | House | House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Amended to Finance |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government |