CO HB1067 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning clarifying changes to measures that ensure defendants have a prompt bond hearing, and, in connection therewith, making and reducing an appropriation.
Title
Clarifiying Changes To Ensure Prompt Bond Hearings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1067, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1067, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reconsider (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.004 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1067, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1067 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1067 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment F) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1067 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 36 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1067, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1067, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1067, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1067, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1067, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reconsider (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.004 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1067, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1067 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1067 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment F) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1067 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 36 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1067, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1067, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1067, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-10 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-05-09 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2022-05-06 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2022-05-06 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2022-05-04 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2022-05-03 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2022-04-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-04-08 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-01-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |