CO HB1062 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the Grand Junction regional center campus.
Title
Grand Junction Regional Center Campus
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1062 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1062, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1062, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Joint - Capital Development Committee: Recommend support for HB 19-1062 with amendment L.001. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1062 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1062, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1062, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Joint - Capital Development Committee: Recommend support for HB 19-1062 with amendment L.001. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Governor Signed | |
2019-02-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-02-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2019-01-31 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-01-30 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |