CO HB1057 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-15 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-15 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cnty Sheriff Service Of Process
Title
Cnty Sheriff Service Of Process
Sponsors
Rep. Su Ryden [D] | Sen. Nancy Spence [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1057 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1057, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1057, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-04-07 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-07 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-04-05 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-03-22 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-19 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-15 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-24 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary | |
2010-02-19 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-18 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-17 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-02-11 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |