CO HB1054 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning partnerships between local governments and military installations, and, in connection therewith, identifying shared-service opportunities to reduce costs and increase efficiencies.
Title
Community-military Cooperation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 17-1054 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Local Government: Adopt amendment L.002. This amendment strikes everything below the enacting clause. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-08 - House - House Local Government: Refer House Bill 17-1054 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 17-1054 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Local Government: Adopt amendment L.002. This amendment strikes everything below the enacting clause. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-08 - House - House Local Government: Refer House Bill 17-1054 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor Signed | |
2017-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-08 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |
2017-02-15 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-13 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | House Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |