CO HB1054 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lessen Unempl Ins Benefit Reduction Retirement
Title
Lessen Unempl Ins Benefit Reduction Retirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1054 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1054 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1054 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1054 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1054 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1054 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1054 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-03-26 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2013-02-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-08 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-02-07 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed |
2013-02-05 | House | House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development |