CO HB1051 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public Trustee For City And County Of Denver
Title
Public Trustee For City And County Of Denver
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 13-1051 to the Committee of the Whole, unamended, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 13-1051 to the Committee of the Whole, unamended, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 13-1051 to the Committee of the Whole, unamended, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-08 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-03-05 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |
2013-02-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-06 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-01-31 | House | House Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |