CO HB1050 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning facilitating the integration of international medical graduates into the Colorado health-care workforce.
Title
International Medical Graduate Integrate Health-care Workforce
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1050 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1050, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1050, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 22-1050, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 22-1050, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1050 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1050, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1050, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 22-1050, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 22-1050, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-07 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2022-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-05 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-05-05 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-09 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-01-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |