CO HB1041 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Update Colo Ins Guaranty Assn Statute
Title
Update Colo Ins Guaranty Assn Statute
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1041 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1041 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1041 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1041, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1041, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1041, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1041 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1041 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1041, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1041, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1041, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-11 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-03-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-03-03 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-03-02 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-25 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-02-21 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-31 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary | |
2011-01-31 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-01-28 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-01-25 | House Second Reading Laid Over to 01/28/2011 | |
2011-01-20 | House Committee on Economic and Business Development Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-12 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Economic and Business Development |