CO HB1040 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning incentives for provision of sex offender services in the department of corrections.
Title
Inmate Treatment Incentive Plans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1040 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1040 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1040 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1040, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1040 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1040 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1040 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1040, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Governor Signed | |
2018-04-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-03-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-20 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-03-16 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations |