CO HB1038 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
County Sheriff Optional Affiliation With FPPA
Title
County Sheriff Optional Affiliation With FPPA
Sponsors
Rep. Jovan Melton [D] | Sen. Matt Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1038 to the Committee of the Whole. Consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1038 to the Committee of the Whole. Consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1038 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1038 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1038 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1038 to the Committee of the Whole. Consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1038 to the Committee of the Whole. Consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1038 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1038 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1038 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-03-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-03-22 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2016-01-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-01-25 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-01-20 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-01-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |