CO HB1037 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the ability of a person to operate a dual marijuana business at the same location.
Title
Retail And Medical Marijuana Same Location
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 22-1037 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 22-1037 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 22-1037 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 22-1037 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Governor Signed | |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-04-04 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-04-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |
2022-02-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-18 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |