CO HB1031 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ban Use Sale Possession Of Powdered Alcohol
Title
Ban Use Sale Possession Of Powdered Alcohol
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1031 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend amendment L.003, line 22, after "powdered" add "or crystalline" (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1031, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B), as amended (Y: 3 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt severed section A of amendment L.004 (Attachment C). Severed section A consists of lines 1 and 2 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend amendment L.003, line 22, after "powdered" add "or crystalline" (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B), as amended (Y: 3 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt severed section A of amendment L.004 (Attachment C). Severed section A consists of lines 1 and 2 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1031, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend amendment L.003, line 22, after "powdered" add "or crystalline" (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1031, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B), as amended (Y: 3 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt severed section A of amendment L.004 (Attachment C). Severed section A consists of lines 1 and 2 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend amendment L.003, line 22, after "powdered" add "or crystalline" (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B), as amended (Y: 3 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt severed section A of amendment L.004 (Attachment C). Severed section A consists of lines 1 and 2 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1031, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-03-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-03-20 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-03-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-03-19 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2015-03-06 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 03/06/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-02-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-01-30 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-01-29 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-01-26 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-01-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |